OR SM201 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to enact and President to sign Trade Reform, Accountability, Development and Employment (TRADE) Act of 2009.
Title
Urging Congress to enact and President to sign Trade Reform, Accountability, Development and Employment (TRADE) Act of 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | Filed With Secretary of State. | |
2012-02-13 | President signed. | |
2012-02-10 | Final reading. Carried by Shields. Adopted. Ayes, 21; nays, 6--Ferrioli, George, Kruse, Telfer, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 3--Bates, Morse, Starr. | |
2012-02-09 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-09 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |