OR SJR23 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to allow Legislative Assembly, by passage of joint resolution, to repeal administrative rule or amendment of administrative rule adopted by executive branch agency. Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to allow Legislative Assembly, by passage of joint resolution, to repeal administrative rule or amendment of administrative rule adopted by executive branch agency. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to administrative rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Linthicum. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Rules failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 18--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |