OR SJR204 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to require Legislative Assembly each biennium to spend percentage of legislatively approved budget for education and for public safety. Defines terms. Applies to biennia beginning on or after July 1, 2017. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to finance.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Herman Baertschiger [R] | Sen. Brian Boquist [R] |
Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. Alan Olsen [R] | Rep. Mark Johnson [R] |
Rep. Sherrie Sprenger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Rules failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 17--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 2--Prozanski, Winters. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules, then Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2016R1/Measures/Overview/SJR204 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2016R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR204/Introduced |