OR SJR203 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to remove requirement that bonded indebtedness incurred under Article XI-G be matched by amount at least equal to amount of indebtedness. Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to remove requirement that bonded indebtedness incurred under Article XI-G be matched by amount at least equal to amount of indebtedness. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to bonding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2022R1/Measures/Overview/SJR203 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2022R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR203/Introduced |