OR SJR203 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rescinds Senate Joint Resolution 34 (2013). Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to allow person serving as judge to be employed by Oregon National Guard for purpose of performing military service or by public university for purpose of teaching. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to employment of person serving as judge.
Sponsors
Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Rep. Philip Barnhart [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Val Hoyle [D] |
Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt and refer to Rules by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt and refer to Rules by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-28 | House | Read. Carried by Barnhart. Adopted.Ayes, 51; Nays, 7--Bentz, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Johnson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Smith; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Berger. |
2014-02-27 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2014-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2014-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Prozanski. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Beyer. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt and be referred to Rules by prior reference. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Rules. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |