OR SJR202 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution creating State Board of Education. Directs State Board of Education to appoint Superintendent of Public Instruction and to establish policies for administration and operation of public elementary and secondary schools, community colleges and public universities. Provides for Governor to continue to serve as Superintendent of Public Instruction until State Board of Education first appoints Superintendent of Public Instruction. Delays transfer of duties related to public universities until March 15, 2016. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to the creation of the State Board of Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Rules by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Rules by prior reference. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development, then Rules. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |