OR SJR201 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - Awaiting posting of Committee Report upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - Awaiting posting of Committee Report upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to modify portion of each house of Legislative Assembly needed to be in attendance for quorum necessary for house to conduct business. Proposes comparable changes to quorum requirements when Legislative Assembly convenes following declaration of catastrophic disaster by Governor. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to quorum requirements for each house of the Legislative Assembly to conduct business.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | Awaiting posting of Committee Report upon adjournment. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |