OR SJR20 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to allowing state to borrow funds to partially fund endowments at public universities.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to allowing state to borrow funds to partially fund endowments at public universities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-03-01 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development, then Finance and Revenue, then Rules. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/sjr1.dir/sjr0020.intro.html |