OR SJM6 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urges Congress to allow state to maintain itself on daylight saving time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to allow state to maintain itself on daylight saving time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Special Order (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateFiled With Secretary of State.
2019-06-14HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-14SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-12SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and readopted Memorial. Ayes, 29.
2019-06-06HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Post, Lively. Adopted. Ayes, 41; Nays, 16--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Evans, Gorsek, Hayden, McLain, McLane, Reschke, Smith Warner, Stark, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 3--Findley, Greenlick, Marsh.
2019-06-06HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 6, 2019 Calendar.
2019-06-04HouseRecommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-06-03HouseWork Session held.
2019-05-29HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-04-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-04-02SenateFinal reading. Carried by Thatcher. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Heard, Linthicum, Olsen.
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading.
2019-04-01SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-03-26SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-12SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Business and General Government.
2019-02-28SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SJM6
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJM6/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJM6/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJM6/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJM6/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28383
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=455553
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29804
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=472677
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=474122

Bill Comments

feedback