OR SJM202 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to enact legislation to define and regulate rapid fire enhancing accessories in same manner as fully automatic weapons, and to define and regulate partially completed firearms components and kits and firearms that are assembled from them.
Title
Urging Congress to define and regulate rapid fire enhancing accessories in same manner as fully automatic weapons, and to define and regulate partially completed firearms components and kits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted and requesting referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted and be referred to Rules. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |