OR SJM201 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges President and Congress to pursue Oregon and California Railroad grant land management reforms.
Title
Urging President and Congress to pursue Oregon and California Railroad grant land management reforms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Rules. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |