OR SCR6 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
In memoriam: Army Specialist Nickolas S. Welch, 1987-2013.
Title
In memoriam: Army Specialist Nickolas S. Welch, 1987-2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read. Carried by Evans. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Barton; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer. |
2015-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 9, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-06-04 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-06-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-28 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2015-05-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-15 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2015-05-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Taken from 04-28 Calendar and placed on 05-12 Calendar on voice vote. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |