OR SCR4 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Referred to Rules.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Declares policy of State of Oregon concerning cybersecurity risks and need for proactive cybersecurity risk management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaring policy of State of Oregon concerning cybersecurity risks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-03-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-03-04SenateFinal reading. Carried by Linthicum. Adopted. Ayes, 24; Nays, 1--Thomsen; Excused, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Hass, Heard, President Courtney, Wagner.
2019-02-28SenateSecond reading.
2019-02-28SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-02-26SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback