OR SCR3 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
In memoriam: Representative Merwyn Ronald "Mitch" Greenlick, 1935-2020. In memoriam: Representative Merwyn Ronald "Mitch" Greenlick, 1935-2020.
Title
In memoriam: Representative Merwyn Ronald "Mitch" Greenlick.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and readopted Resolution. Ayes, 24; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 5--Boquist, Findley, Frederick, Gelser, Thatcher. |
2021-05-25 | House | Read. Carried by Nosse. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hayden. |
2021-05-20 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-03-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Riley, Steiner Hayward. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Boquist, Heard. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |