OR SCR3 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
Pending: House Veterans and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes and honors Radarman 2nd Class Garry Bradbury Hodgson (1937-1969) for his service to his country.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing and honoring Radarman 2nd Class Garry Bradbury Hodgson for his service to his country.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-04-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-04-02SenateFinal reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Olsen.
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading.
2019-04-01SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-03-27SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback