OR SCR3 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes contributions and sacrifices of Peace Corps volunteers from Oregon and throughout United States.
Title
Recognizing contributions and sacrifices of Peace Corps volunteers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2015-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-11 | House | Read. Carried by Kennemer. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Esquivel, Taylor. |
2015-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-06-08 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-06-03 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Dembrow. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Taken from 02-24 Calendar and placed on 02-26 Calendar by unanimous consent. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |