OR SCR27 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to Rules by order of the President.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Encourages restaurants offering beverages to list milk as option for purchase.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging restaurants offering beverages to list milk as option for purchase.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Rules by order of the President.
2019-04-09SenateRecommendation: Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Rules.
2019-04-04SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2019-03-04SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback