OR SCR22 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Apologizes to Robert Parker for 31 years of suffering injuries and effects of racism and institutional bias that has denied him admission to Oregon State Bar and urges Oregon Supreme Court to admit Robert Parker to bar. Apologizes to Robert Parker for 31 years of suffering injuries and effects of racism and institutional bias that has denied him admission to Oregon State Bar and urges Oregon Supreme Court to admit Robert Parker to bar.
Title
Apologizing to Robert Parker for 31 years of suffering injuries and effects of racism and institutional bias that has denied him admission to Oregon State Bar and urging Oregon Supreme Court to admit Robert Parker to bar.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2021-06-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-16 | House | Read. Carried by Meek. Adopted. Ayes, 44; Nays, 12--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Levy, Lewis, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 1--Wilde; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Morgan, Stark. |
2021-06-15 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2021-06-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-05-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Frederick. Adopted. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Findley, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |