OR SCR22 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends 2018 national champion Oregon State University Beavers baseball team for outstanding season.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending 2018 national champion Oregon State University Beavers baseball team.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House Special Order (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateFiled With Secretary of State.
2019-04-22HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-22SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-17HouseRead as Special Order of Business. Carried by Boshart Davis. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Nosse.
2019-04-16HouseRules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 17, 2019 Calendar.
2019-04-16HouseRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-04-15HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-03-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-03-25SenateFinal reading. Carried by Gelser. Adopted. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Bentz, Heard, Johnson, Winters.
2019-03-21SenateSecond reading.
2019-03-21SenateRecommendation: Be adopted.
2019-03-18SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Education.
2019-02-12SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback