OR SCR211 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adjourning sine die 2012 regular session of Seventy-sixth Legislative Assembly.
Title
Adjourning sine die 2012 regular session of Seventy-sixth Legislative Assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Filed With Secretary of State. | |
2012-03-21 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-06 | President signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Rules suspended. Adopted. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-03-05 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-03-05 | Rules suspended. Carried by Ferrioli, Rosenbaum. Resolution read in its entirety. Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Atkinson, Olsen; excused, 1--Bates. | |
2012-03-02 | Carried over to 03-05 by unanimous consent. | |
2012-03-01 | Carried over to 03-02 by unanimous consent. | |
2012-02-29 | Carried over to 03-01 by unanimous consent. | |
2012-02-28 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-28 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-27 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-20 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-20 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |