OR SCR205 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honors visionary Oregon musician Curtis Salgado.
Title
Honoring visionary Oregon musician Curtis Salgado.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Taken from 02-11 Calendar and placed on 02-14 Calendar on voice vote. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |