OR SCR204 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating centennial of woman suffrage in Oregon.
Title
Commemorating centennial of woman suffrage in Oregon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Filed With Secretary of State. | |
2012-02-27 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-21 | President signed. | |
2012-02-20 | Read. Carried by Berger. Adopted. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-17 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-16 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-08 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-07 | Final reading. Carried by Ferrioli, Rosenbaum. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-07 | Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote. | |
2012-02-06 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-06 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-03 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |