OR SCR203 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adjourns sine die 2022 regular session of Eighty-first Legislative Assembly. Adjourns sine die 2022 regular session of Eighty-first Legislative Assembly.
Title
Adjourning sine die 2022 regular session of Eighty-first Legislative Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Read. Carried by Smith Warner. Adopted. Ayes, 51; Nays, 2--Cate, Wilde; Excused, 5--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Prusak, Scharf, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Owens, Reschke. |
2022-03-04 | House | First reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Wagner. Adopted. Ayes, 25; Absent, 2--Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Carried over to 03-04 by unanimous consent. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |