OR SCR203 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adjourns sine die 2018 regular session of Seventy-ninth Legislative Assembly.
Title
Adjourning sine die the 2018 regular session of Seventy-ninth Legislative Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - House - House Rules suspended (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Read in its entirety. Carried by Barnhart. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard. |
2018-03-03 | House | First reading. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Final reading. Read in its entirety. Carried by Burdick. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |