OR SCR203 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating Jubilee Year of Sisters of Saint Mary of Oregon and their 125 years of dedicated ministry and service.
Title
Commemorating Jubilee Year of Sisters of Saint Mary of Oregon and their 125 years of dedicated ministry and service.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Sen. Richard Devlin [D] | Sen. Mark Hass [D] | Rep. Betty Komp [D] |
Rep. Shawn Lindsay [R] | Rep. Tobias Read [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Filed With Secretary of State. | |
2012-02-27 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-21 | President signed. | |
2012-02-20 | Read. Carried by Barker. Adopted. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-17 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-16 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-02-09 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-08 | Final reading. Carried by Hass. Adopted. Ayes, 29; excused, 1 - Johnson. | |
2012-02-07 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-07 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |