OR SCR201 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
In memoriam: Brady Adams, 1945-2015.
Title
In memoriam: Brady Adams, 1945-2015.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2016-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-26 | House | Read. Carried by Wilson. Adopted.Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Boone, Heard, Smith, Witt. |
2016-02-25 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2016-02-24 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Burdick, Ferrioli. Adopted.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Winters. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Taken from 02-05 Calendar and placed on 02-18 Calendar on voice vote. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |