OR SCR201 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Celebrates 100th anniversary of Oregon Supreme Court Building.
Title
Celebrating the 100th anniversary of the Oregon Supreme Court Building.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-28 | House | Read. Carried by Hicks. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Smith; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Berger. |
2014-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2014 Calendar. |
2014-02-26 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Rosenbaum, Ferrioli. Adopted.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Taken from 02-11 Calendar and placed on 02-14 Calendar on voice vote. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |