OR SCR2 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors service members of Oregon National Guard. Recognizes and honors service members of Oregon National Guard.
Title
Recognizing and honoring service members of Oregon National Guard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - House Special Order (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2023-03-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-03-22 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Evans. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Goodwin, Levy E, Reschke, Smith G. |
2023-03-22 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 03-22 Calendar. |
2023-03-21 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2023-03-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Thatcher. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Robinson. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Carried over to 02-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Carried over to 02-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |