OR SCR11 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Staff Sergeant Don Anderson for his service to his country.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Staff Sergeant Don Anderson for his service to his country.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2019-05-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-13 | House | Read. Carried by Zika. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Helm; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans. |
2019-05-10 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-05-07 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-03-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Johnson. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Boquist, President Courtney, Thomsen. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |