OR SCR10 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adjourns organizational session of Eightieth Legislative Assembly. Provides that Eightieth Legislative Assembly shall convene in regular session on January 22, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjourning organizational session of Eightieth Legislative Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-14 - House - House Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28SenateFiled With Secretary of State.
2019-01-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-01-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-01-14HouseAdopted. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith G.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-01-14SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2019-01-14SenateFinal reading. Carried by Burdick. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Boquist.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback