OR SCR10 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Reserve Deputy Robert Milton Riley (1922-1958) for his service to this state.
Title
Recognizing and honoring Reserve Deputy Robert Milton Riley for his service to this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - House - House Special Order (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2017-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-15 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Lewis. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Bentz, Boone. |
2017-06-14 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-13 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-06-07 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-03-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Prozanski. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Taken from 03-02 Calendar and placed on 03-09 Calendar on voice vote. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |