OR SCR1 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Declares legislative support for closed-loop pump storage energy projects. Declares legislative support for closed-loop pump storage energy projects.
Title
Declaring legislative support for closed-loop pump storage energy projects.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read. Carried by Helm. Adopted. Ayes, 54; Nays, 3--Findley, Reschke, Smith G; Absent, 1--McLain; Excused, 2--Barreto, Leif. |
2019-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2019-05-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2019-03-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Dembrow. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Linthicum. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |