OR SCR1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Supports adoption of State Plan for Alzheimer's Disease and Related Dementias in Oregon.
Title
Supporting adoption of State Plan for Alzheimer's Disease and Related Dementias in Oregon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | Filed With Secretary of State. |
2013-03-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-03-14 | House | Read. Carried by Kennemer. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Garrett, Matthews, Weidner. |
2013-03-13 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-03-11 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2013-02-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Adopted. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Taken from 02-07 Calendar and placed on 02-12 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |