OR SB995 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to restraining orders. Directs State Court Administrator to study issues relating to civil proceedings and report to committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2020.].
Title
Relating to civil proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 353, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem. |
2019-05-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-29 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-05-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 20; Absent, 8--Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Thomsen, Winters. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |