OR SB98 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Public Utility Commission to adopt by rule large renewable natural gas program and small renewable natural gas program. Requires commission to adopt rules no later than July 31, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to renewable natural gas; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-08SenateEffective date, September 29, 2019.
2019-08-08SenateChapter 541, 2019 Laws.
2019-07-23SenateEffective date, September 29, 2019.
2019-07-23SenateChapter 541, 2019 Laws.
2019-07-15SenateGovernor signed.
2019-06-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-24SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-19HouseThird reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 10--Barreto, Findley, Hayden, Leif, McLane, Post, Reschke, Sprenger, Wallan, Wilson; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Power.
2019-06-18HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-17HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-17HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-13SenateThird reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-12SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-11SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-06-07SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-04SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-04SenateWork Session held.
2019-05-28SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2019-03-19SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-03-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-03-14SenateWork Session held.
2019-02-07SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-28SenateRecommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Environment and Natural Resources by order of the President.
2019-01-25SenateWork Session held.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Carbon Reduction.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB98
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB98/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB98/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB98/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB98/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB98/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB98/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27772
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28193
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29850
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=474686
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=476219

Bill Comments

feedback