OR SB98 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain persons that service residential mortgage loans in this state to obtain or renew license. Specifies license application and renewal procedures and required fees. Prescribes duties of licensee and prohibits certain activities relating to negotiating or offering to negotiate modification of terms of residential mortgage loan. Requires licensee to maintain specified liquidity, operating reserves and net worth. Prescribes civil penalties against persons that engage in business as residential mortgage loan servicer without license. Permits Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to remove member of licensee's governing body or licensee's officer under certain circumstances. Permits director to participate in multistate mortgage examinations under specified circumstances. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to residential mortgage loan servicers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | Senate | Effective date, August 2, 2017. |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Chapter 636, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed.Ayes, 51; Nays, 3--McLane, Noble, Reschke; Excused, 1--Johnson; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Fahey, Marsh, Nearman, Smith G, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-27 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Girod, Linthicum; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |