OR SB978 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of State Police to conduct study on reporting of attempted unlawful firearm transfers and present report on findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary on or before September 15, 2020. Sunsets January 2, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-04-17SenateMinority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed Minority) Refer to Rules by order of the President. (Not concurring Senator Linthicum, Thatcher)
2019-04-17SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng). Referred to Rules by Order of the President.
2019-04-09SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-02SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-03-04SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback