OR SB974 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 530, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 530, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits persons other than retail customers of vehicle dealer from making claim against vehicle dealer when vehicle dealer is authorized to deal exclusively in motorcycles, mopeds, Class I all-terrain vehicles or snowmobiles or any combination of those vehicles. Prohibits Department of Transportation from issuing vehicle dealer certificate that authorizes person to deal exclusively in motorcycles, mopeds, Class I all-terrain vehicles or snowmobiles or any combination of those vehicles.
Title
Relating to vehicle dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 530, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | DeBoer declared potential conflict of interest. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen. |
2017-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Bentz, Boone, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-05-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | DeBoer declared potential conflict of interest. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Carried over to 04-26 by unanimous consent. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |