OR SB969 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Effective date, August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Effective date, August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Reentry, Employment and Housing. Requires report to Legislative Assembly no later than December 15, 2015. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to persons with criminal convictions; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jackie Winters [R] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] |
Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Senate | Effective date, August 12, 2015. |
2015-08-13 | Senate | Chapter 848, 2015 Laws. |
2015-08-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 6--Gilliam, Hayden, Heard, Post, Weidner, Whitsett. |
2015-07-02 | House | Second reading. |
2015-07-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-07-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-07-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters, Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 23; nays, 4--Girod, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Knopp, Olsen. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |