OR SB968 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Effective date, January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies criteria for membership on System of Care Advisory Council. Modifies criteria for membership on System of Care Advisory Council. Modifies duties of System of Care Advisory] council.
Title
Relating to systems of care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2024. |
2023-07-21 | Senate | Chapter 293, 2023 Laws. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Hansell. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 20; Nays, 2--Findley, Smith DB; Absent, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 1--Girod. |
2023-05-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reynolds. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 17--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Cramer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, McIntire, Morgan, Owens, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 3--Evans, Osborne, Sosa; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis. |
2023-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-16 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2023-05-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-07 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services. |
2023-04-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Carried over to 04-04 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Carried over to 04-03 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Carried over to 03-30 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Carried over to 03-29 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |