OR SB968 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person who was under 18 years of age at time of committing offense from being sentenced to life imprisonment without possibility of release or parole. Requires court to consider certain factors as mitigation when sentencing person who was under 18 years of age at time of committing offense. Directs court to include in judgment document age of defendant at time of committing offense and fact that person is eligible for hearing and release after serving 15 years of sentence of imprisonment. Establishes process for hearing with State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision for persons who were under 18 years of age at time of committing offense and who have served 15 years of sentence of imprisonment. Authorizes release of person on parole or post-prison supervision if certain findings are made. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to sentences for juvenile offenders; prescribing an effective date; providing for criminal sentence reduction that requires approval by a two-thirds majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB968 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB968/Introduced |