OR SB960 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes investigatory procedures for reports of suspected sexual conduct. Directs Department of Education to conduct investigations of sexual conduct. Requires department to establish sexual conduct registry and education providers to check registry. Requires education provider to take necessary actions to ensure student's safety during investigation. Prescribes notification duties of Department of Education and Department of Human Services related to reports of suspected abuse and sexual conduct.
Title
Relating to investigations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB960 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB960/Introduced |