OR SB946 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Effective date, August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates position of Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual and Transgender Coordinator in Department of Veterans' Affairs to provide outreach and assistance to veterans who are lesbian, gay, bisexual and transgender, and to spouses and dependents of such veterans. Requires department to report to Legislative Assembly regarding implementation and status of coordinator position no later than September 15, 2018. Appropriates moneys to department from General Fund to implement and administer coordinator position. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to veterans; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - House - House Motion to Rerefer (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-13SenateEffective date, August 12, 2015.
2015-08-13SenateChapter 847, 2015 Laws.
2015-08-12SenateGovernor signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-07SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-06HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Barreto, Bentz, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Buehler.
2015-07-06HouseRules suspended. Motion to rerefer to Rules failed.Ayes, 23; Nays, 36--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, Nathanson, Nosse, Parrish, Piluso, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 1--Buehler.
2015-07-06HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gomberg.
2015-07-06HouseSecond reading.
2015-07-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2015-07-03HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-07-03SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 5--Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Whitsett; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-02SenateSecond reading.
2015-07-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2015-06-30SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-29SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-23SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-23SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-06-03SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2015-04-17SenateRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2015-04-14SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-04-03SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness, then Ways and Means.
2015-04-02SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB946
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB946/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB946/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB946/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB946/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21610
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23344
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364482
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=365022
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=365027

Bill Comments

feedback