OR SB932 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - Effective date, August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extends eligibility for receiving Oregon financial aid scholarships and grants to certain students who qualify for exemption from paying nonresident tuition. Removes requirements that certain students must enroll at public university within three years of graduating high school or graduate from public university within five years of initial enrollment to be entitled to exemption from nonresident tuition and fees at public universities. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to cost of attending public universities; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - House - House Motion to Rerefer (Y: 25 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-13SenateEffective date, August 12, 2015.
2015-08-13SenateChapter 846, 2015 Laws.
2015-08-12SenateGovernor signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-07SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-03SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 17; nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-02HousePassed.Ayes, 34; Nays, 25--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Barton.
2015-07-02HouseMotion to rerefer to Rules failed.Ayes, 25; Nays, 34--Barker, Barnhart, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 1--Barton.
2015-07-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Gallegos.
2015-07-01HouseSecond reading.
2015-07-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
2015-06-30HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-25HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-06-25HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-06-25SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 2--Boquist, Olsen.
2015-06-24SenateTaken from 06-24 Calendar and placed on 06-25 Calendar.Ayes, 17; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; absent, 1--Beyer; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-06-23SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-06-19SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-15SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-15SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-12SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2015-04-07SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2015-04-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2015-04-02SenateWork Session held.
2015-03-24SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-19SenateReferred to Education.
2015-03-19SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB932
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB932/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB932/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB932/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB932/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB932/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB932/House%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB932/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB932/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21366
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23096
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=361688
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=361983
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364061
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364065
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364481

Bill Comments

feedback