OR SB929 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates tax credit for certified historic property project contributions. Directs Department of Revenue, in cooperation with State Historic Preservation Officer, to conduct auction of tax credits. Establishes State Historic Property Project Fund and requires that auction proceeds be deposited in fund for purpose of making rebates to property owners for eligible expenses for rehabilitation and seismic retrofitting of historic properties. Provides for payment of rebates from fund and for administration of rebate program by State Historic Preservation Officer. Limits amount of credits and corresponding rebates to $___ million for any biennium. Applies to applications for rebates submitted after July 1, 2019, for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, and before January 1, 2026. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a tax credit for funding historic property project expense rebates; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Tax Expenditures by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Tax Expenditures, then Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |