OR SB924 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, June 13, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective date, June 13, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies juvenile code to prohibit placement of children and wards taken into protective custody in detention facilities. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the deinstitutionalization of children taken into protective custody; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Judiciary and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Judiciary and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Effective date, June 13, 2019. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 382, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Meek, Rayfield. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Thomsen; Excused, 2--Riley, Winters. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary by order of the President. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |