OR SB923 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Higher Education Coordinating Commission for distribution to public universities. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Olsen [R] | Sen. Herman Baertschiger [R] | Sen. Ted Ferrioli [R] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] |
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Education failed.Ayes, 12; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB923 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB923/Introduced |