OR SB921 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies child abuse reporting requirements to add hotelkeepers and innkeepers as mandatory reporters of child abuse. Modifies requirement for processor of photographic images or computer technician to report visual recording of child involved in sexually explicit conduct. Punishes failure to report by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both.
Title
Relating to mandatory reporting of child abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Judiciary by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary by prior reference. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Judiciary by prior reference. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Judiciary. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |