OR SB916 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Health Authority, Oregon Medical Board and Oregon State Board of Nursing to study clinical guidance and health outcomes regarding Lyme disease and report to Legislative Assembly by March 1, 2016. Directs Oregon Medical Board and Oregon State Board of Nursing to adopt rules regarding diagnosis and treatment of Lyme disease.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Lyme disease; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-05-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-05-07HouseReferred to Health Care.
2015-05-04HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2015-04-30SenateThird reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Bates, Dembrow, Girod, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Whitsett.
2015-04-29SenateCarried over to 04-30 by unanimous consent.
2015-04-28SenateSecond reading.
2015-04-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2015-04-20SenateWork Session held.
2015-03-30SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-06SenateReferred to Health Care.
2015-03-04SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback