OR SB912 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of terms "sexual conduct" and "substantiated report" for purposes of certain laws related to abuse and sexual conduct by school employees. Requires report of suspected sexual conduct be made to law enforcement agency or Department of Human Services. Expands reporting and investigation requirements to sexual conduct by students. Requires public or private official to report sexual conduct by regulated public or private official and to report student sexual conduct. Directs Department of Human Services and law enforcement to conduct investigation related to report.] Requires department and law enforcement agency to notify regulatory board of regulated public or private official of findings related to sexual conduct. Directs regulatory board to initiate disciplinary proceedings if department or law enforcement finds reasonable cause to believe that sexual conduct occurred.] Requires department and law enforcement agency to notify school district of findings related to student sexual conduct.] Creates civil action for damages for failure by certain school employees to make report of suspected sexual conduct. Directs Department of Education to evaluate criminal records checks to determine percentage of total number of criminal records checks requested by private schools that indicated person being checked engaged in sexual conduct toward child. Requires department to report results of evaluation to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to sexual conduct toward children; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |